UPSU-Trustees-Report-and-Financial-Statements-July-2019.PDF
➤ Gửi thông báo lỗi ⚠️ Báo cáo tài liệu vi phạmNội dung chi tiết: UPSU-Trustees-Report-and-Financial-Statements-July-2019.PDF
UPSU-Trustees-Report-and-Financial-Statements-July-2019.PDF
Registered number: 10676070Charity number: 1172830THE UNIVERSITY OF PLYMOUTH STUDENTS’ UNION(A COMPANY LIMITED BY GUARANTEE)TRUSTEES' REPORT AND FINAN UPSU-Trustees-Report-and-Financial-Statements-July-2019.PDFNCIAL STATEMENTSFOR THE YEAR ENDED 31 JULY 2019Bishop FlemingTHE UNIVERSITY OF PLYMOUTH STUDENTS’ UNION(A COMPANY LIMITED BY GUARANTEE)CONTENTSPageReference and administrative details of the Company, its Trustees and advisers44928Trustees' report45000Trustees’ responsibilities statement16Independent UPSU-Trustees-Report-and-Financial-Statements-July-2019.PDF auditors' report on the financial statements19Consolidated statement of financial activities20Consolidated balance sheet21 - 22Company balance sheet2UPSU-Trustees-Report-and-Financial-Statements-July-2019.PDF
3 - 24Consolidated statement of cash flows25Notes to the financial statements26 - 51THE UNIVERSITY OF PLYMOUTH STUDENTS’ UNION(A COMPANY LIMITED BY GURegistered number: 10676070Charity number: 1172830THE UNIVERSITY OF PLYMOUTH STUDENTS’ UNION(A COMPANY LIMITED BY GUARANTEE)TRUSTEES' REPORT AND FINAN UPSU-Trustees-Report-and-Financial-Statements-July-2019.PDF20 (From 1 July 2019) Matilda Fraser. President Mille Green, VP Education Verity Lemm, VP Sports Walter Bitty' Inyang. VP Activities and Development Chukwudi Ezenyi. VP Wellbeing and Diversity 2018/19 (From 1 July 2018 to 30 June 2019) Alex Doyle. President Maja Smith. VP Education (Resigned 26 May UPSU-Trustees-Report-and-Financial-Statements-July-2019.PDF2019) Charlotte Panchaud, VP Activities and Development Walter Bitty Inyang, VP Communities Matilda Fraser. VP Welfare and Diversity Student TrusteesUPSU-Trustees-Report-and-Financial-Statements-July-2019.PDF
Hadiza Adah (End of term 31 July 2019) Neil Marshall Independent External Trustees Jane Hopkinson James Hemsley Graham Stirling Helen Cocks (appointedRegistered number: 10676070Charity number: 1172830THE UNIVERSITY OF PLYMOUTH STUDENTS’ UNION(A COMPANY LIMITED BY GUARANTEE)TRUSTEES' REPORT AND FINAN UPSU-Trustees-Report-and-Financial-Statements-July-2019.PDFfficeStudents' Union Building University of Plymouth Drake Circus Plymouth PL4 8AACompany secretaryDaniel MatthewsDirector TeamGina Connelly. Chief Executive Sarah Davey, Deputy Chief Executive and Director of Membership Services Oliver Horne. Director of Marketing and Communications Velu Balasubram UPSU-Trustees-Report-and-Financial-Statements-July-2019.PDFanian, Director of Commercial Services Daniel Matthews. Director of Central ServicesPage 1THE UNIVERSITY OF PLYMOUTH STUDENTS' UNION(A COMPANY LIMITEDUPSU-Trustees-Report-and-Financial-Statements-July-2019.PDF
BY GUARANTEE)REFERENCE AND ADMINISTRATIVE DETAILS OF THE COMPANY, ITS TRUSTEES AND ADVISERS (CONTINUED)FOR THE YEAR ENDED 31 JULY 2019Registered number: 10676070Charity number: 1172830THE UNIVERSITY OF PLYMOUTH STUDENTS’ UNION(A COMPANY LIMITED BY GUARANTEE)TRUSTEES' REPORT AND FINANRegistered number: 10676070Charity number: 1172830THE UNIVERSITY OF PLYMOUTH STUDENTS’ UNION(A COMPANY LIMITED BY GUARANTEE)TRUSTEES' REPORT AND FINANGọi ngay
Chat zalo
Facebook